Nigam, Tara (CPSO#: 67105)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara Nigam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 1-877-398-5932 www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 06 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016