Nigen, Simon Roland Joseph (CPSO#: 78545)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009