Nigil Haroon, Nisha (CPSO#: 92245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2015

Expiry Date:  19 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523 7100 Ext. 4791
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite M277
865 Regent St. South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: 705 675 4791
Fax: 705 675 4792
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nigil Haroon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nigil Haroon ( CPSO# 92245 )
Dr. N. Haroon ( CPSO# 88065 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Rheumatology
399 Bathurst Street
1EW-425
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5634

Business Address:
Suite M277
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 675-4791

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Aug 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 20 Aug 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nisha Nigil Haroon may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that is approved by the Chair, Division of Clinical
                        Sciences, Northern  Ontario  School of Medicine, in which Dr. Nigil
                        Haroon  holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires seven years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Nigil  Haroon   no  longer  holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Nigil Haroon's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Nigil  Haroon's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on August 20, 2015, and expires on August 19,
                  2018.  Upon renewal of Dr. Nigil  Haroon's  academic  appointment  at the
                  Northern  Ontario  School  of  Medicine, the expiry date can be extended,
                  subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.