Nigl, Jeffrey Tobias (CPSO#: 107868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2017

Expiry Date:  20 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouelette Campus
1030 Ouelette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411 Ext. 34401
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52222
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blue ( CPSO# 94354 )
Dr. J. Nigl ( CPSO# 107868)

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 915-7125

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Hawaii
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jeffrey  Tobias  Nigl  may  practise emergency medicine with Windsor
                  Regional  Hospital   in  Windsor,  Ontario,   while   under   supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration will automatically expire on August  20,
                  2018.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Nigl's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College  by  the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Nigl's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report,  pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Nigl's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 23, 2017, and will expire on or before
                  August 20, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.