Nigro, Frank (CPSO#: 63777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6206
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Nigro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2009


Corporation Name: Frank Nigro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nigro ( CPSO# 63777 )

Business Address:
The Port Arthur Clinic
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK NIGRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIGRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992