Nijhawan, Monica (CPSO#: 85469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Bhayana, Monica (used until: 30 Oct 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Nijhawan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nijhawan ( CPSO# 85469 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA NIJHAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJHAWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008