Nijhawan, Navdeep (CPSO#: 69193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4906
Fax: (905) 721-3559
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Herzig Eye Institute
131 Bloor Street West
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navdeep Nijhawan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nijhawan ( CPSO# 69193 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4906

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Herzig Eye Institute
Suite 210
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVDEEP NIJHAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJHAWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000