Nijjar, Satnam Singh (CPSO#: 86664)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009