Nikapota, Ashok Damanta Bandara (CPSO#: 89910)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:St. George's Hospital Medical School, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009