Nikolic, Ana (CPSO#: 69192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esiahas Amdemichael, Dr. Ana Nikolic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nikolic ( CPSO# 69192 )
Dr. E. Amdemichael ( CPSO# 62458 )

Business Address:
Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 578-1332

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA NIKOLIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOLIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1998