Nikon, Yaghoub (CPSO#: 70723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Nikahn, Yaghoub (used until: 14 Sep 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:West Azerbaijan Univ. of Med. Sc.&Health, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
625 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone: (905) 954-1555
Fax: (905) 954-1506
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yaghoub Nikon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Nikon ( CPSO# 70723 )

Business Address:
625 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 954-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAGHOUB NIKON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jul 1996 to 27 Oct 1996
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)