Nikore, Veena (CPSO#: 55015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7
Phone: (519) 751-3604
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 55015 )
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 22798 )

Business Address:
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 751-3604

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VEENA NIKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986