Nikore, Vinay Kumar (CPSO#: 22798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1970

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 759-5971
Fax: (519) 759-5971
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 55015 )
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 22798 )

Business Address:
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 751-3604


Corporation Name: Vineet Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 22798 )
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 84114 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 14, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 26, 2012, Brant Community Healthcare System notified the College that Dr. Vinay Kumar Nikore's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective December 14, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINAY KUMAR NIKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970