Nilanont, Yongchai (CPSO#: 78927)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2003 to 13 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2005