Nilsen, Sandra Gail Elder (CPSO#: 69336)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 21 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 31 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1999