Nimchonok, Punam Mony (CPSO#: 77679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: Singh, Punam Mony (used until: 13 Mar 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 554-4686
Fax: (905) 554-5727
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7155 Woodbine
Woodbine & Steeles Sleep lab
Markham, ON
L3R 1A3
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 416-628-4010
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

301-295 College St.
Centre for Sleep and Chronobiology
Toronto, ON
M5T 1S2
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-9531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

915 Wilson Avenue Unit 15
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-3012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Sleep Disorders/HAG
4040 Finch Ave E, Scarborough, ON
M1S 4V5
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 293-3233
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punam Mony Nimchonok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nimchonok ( CPSO# 77679 )

Business Address:
Suite B103
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 628-4010

Business Address:
Suite 15
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 746-3012

Business Address:
301 - 295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Business Address:
Suite 404
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 554-4686

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 11 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNAM MONY NIMCHONOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMCHONOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006