Niroumand-Sarvestani, Mitra (CPSO#: 65525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 6 207
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8394
Fax: (416) 586-4736
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Niroumand-Sarvestani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Niroumand-Sarvestani ( CPSO# 65525 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 6-207
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITRA NIROUMAND-SARVESTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIROUMAND-SARVESTANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993