Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nisbett, Samuel Benjamin (CPSO#: 54556)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2408 Perth Road
PO Box 17
Glenburnie PO
Glenburnie ON  K0H 1S0
Phone: (613) 895-0608
Fax: (613) 353-7162
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2003