Nissenbaum, Michael Alexander (CPSO#: 52692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RADIMED
1 Westmount Square
Montreal QC  H3Z 2P9
Phone: (514) 932-0211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec
USA - Michigan
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER NISSENBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NISSENBAUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1987