Nistico, Amy Ruth-Ann (CPSO#: 81522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: Sydor, Amy Ruth-Ann (used until: 08 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor North Tower, Room 9618
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 4990
Fax: (705) 523-7340
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Nistico Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nistico ( CPSO# 81522 )

Business Address:
9th Floor North Tower
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Suite 9618
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY RUTH-ANN NISTICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NISTICO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2005 to 21 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2006 to 27 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2007 to 27 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008