Nitkin, Robert Shane (CPSO#: 51281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 297-7277
Fax: (416) 299-4842
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Nitkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nitkin ( CPSO# 51281 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 297-7277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SHANE NITKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1983