Nitsch, Barbara Ann (CPSO#: 53900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Names: Nitsch-Kasman, Barbara Ann (used until: 07 Sep 1999 )     Nitsch, Barbara Ann (used until: 06 Aug 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 700
1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Phone: (416) 388-1455
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Nitsch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nitsch ( CPSO# 53900 )

Business Address:
Suite 700
1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 388-1455

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN NITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITSCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985