Nitsch, Romy (CPSO#: 75222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1327
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romy Nitsch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nitsch ( CPSO# 75222 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-1327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMY NITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITSCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005