Nitti, Nicole Mary (CPSO#: 78868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Access Alliance Multicultural
Community Health Centre
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 324-9697
Fax: (416) 324-9490
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MARY NITTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009