Nixon, Bruce James (CPSO#: 54071)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Longstreet Clinic P.C. Suite 300 1240 Jesse Jewell Parkway Gainesville GA 30501 USA
Date Received: 25 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017