Nixon, Donald Ray (CPSO#: 52892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100C
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 737-3737
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite D
190 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Canada
Phone: (705) 327-5776
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Ray Nixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 16 2010


Corporation Name: Donald R. Nixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nixon ( CPSO# 52892 )

Business Address:
Suite 100C
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 737-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD RAY NIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIXON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985