Nixon, Jane Esther Mary (CPSO#: 60950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Gillingham Drive
Suite 202
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone: (905) 450-0151
Fax: (905) 450-7152
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E.M. Nixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nixon ( CPSO# 60950 )

Business Address:
202 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone Number: (905) 450-0151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ESTHER MARY NIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIXON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990