Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nixon, Judith Pearl (CPSO#: 62769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78469
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH PEARL NIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIXON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1996