Nixon, Mary Kathleen (CPSO#: 58617)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2004