Nizalik, Cindy Louise Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
Department Of Pathology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3607
Fax: (613) 738-4837
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.L. Elizabeth Nizalik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nizalik ( CPSO# 60061 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
Department Of Pathology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY LOUISE ELIZABETH NIZALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIZALIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1990