Nizami, Riaz Munir (CPSO#: 22497)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 1, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Riaz Munir Nizami, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

I, Dr. Riaz Nizami have voluntarily resigned from the College effective April 1, 2013, and have undertaken not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after April 1, 2013.