Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nizzero, Alberto (CPSO#: 57009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200 Ext. 3223
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Nizzero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nizzero ( CPSO# 57009 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
Blind River - St. Joseph District Hospital
523 Causely Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2265

Business Address:
St. Joseph General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
Manitoulin Health Centre
Highway 540
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5311

Business Address:
11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2322

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERTO NIZZERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIZZERO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988