Nkansah, John (CPSO#: 23120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
220 Duncan Mill Road
Don Mills ON  M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 391-5304
Fax: (416) 391-5305
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Nkansah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nkansah ( CPSO# 23120 )

Business Address:
318 - 220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Phone Number: (416) 391-5304

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Barbados
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN NKANSAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NKANSAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1970