Noakes, Jeffrey Elliott (CPSO#: 50902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4430 Bathurst Street
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 630-3174
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E. Noakes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Noakes ( CPSO# 50902 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 630-3174

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ELLIOTT NOAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOAKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983