Noble, Angela Joy (CPSO#: 75926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2001 to 06 Apr 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2014