Noble, Heather Lucille (CPSO#: 58997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
University Of Guelph
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 836-6392
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Phelps Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Phelps ( CPSO# 60171 )
Dr. H. Noble ( CPSO# 58997 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
c/o Department of
Emergency Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER LUCILLE NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1988