Noble, Jason (CPSO#: 82961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 403
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (647) 346-5222
Fax: (647) 346-9222
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M1-202c
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4762
Fax: (416) 480-4481
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 302
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7360
Fax: (905) 472-7148
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Noble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Noble ( CPSO# 82961 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M1-202c
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4762

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite 302
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 475-7360

Business Address:
403 - 2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (647) 346-5222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2010