Noble, Rosemarie (CPSO#: 97561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 304
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 578-3500
Fax: (519) 741-0286
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosemarie Noble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Noble ( CPSO# 97561 )

Business Address:
New Vision Family Health Team
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Business Address:
Suite 304
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMARIE NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014