Nodwell, Samuel Allan Trefor (CPSO#: 83807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Fax: (613) 729-3838
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Preston Square Tower Two
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Nodwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nodwell ( CPSO# 83807 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone Number: (613) 729-1616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL ALLAN TREFOR NODWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NODWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005