Nofech-Mozes, Sharon (CPSO#: 83611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E4 23C
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nofech-Mozes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nofech-Mozes ( CPSO# 83611 )
Dr. Y. Nofech-Mozes ( CPSO# 77775 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E4 23C
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sharon Nofech-Mozes may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Laboratory  Medicine  and  Pathobiology,  University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Nofech-Mozes holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr.  Nofech-
                  Mozes no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.