Noftle, Brooke Malcolm Edward (CPSO#: 61306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Inter Community
Health Centre
659 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642-1532
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 528
528 Dundas Street East
London ON  N6B 1W6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-1533
Fax: (519) 645-1556
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Clinic 217
475 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noftle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Noftle ( CPSO# 61306 )

Business Address:
London Inter Community Health Centre
659 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Phone Number: (519) 660-0874

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BROOKE MALCOLM EDWARD NOFTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOFTLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990