Nolan, Bernard (CPSO#: 21658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1999