Nolan, John Paul (CPSO#: 26787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
176 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Phone: (905) 468-0403
Fax: (905) 468-4805
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL NOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1988
Revoked: Fitness to Practice Committee. Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 15 Feb 1988
Summary:

 On February 15, 1988, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. J. P. Nolan to be an 
 incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 
 62(1)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act.  

The Fitness to Practise Committee ordered on April 1, 
 1997, that the Order of the Committee of February 15, 1988, as varied by the Order of June 29, 
 1990, as varied by the Order of October 30, 1991, be varied such that paragraphs 1 through 14 are 
 deleted and replaced with others.

On July 24, 2003, the Fitness to Practise Committee vacated the 
 terms of its order of April 1, 1997 and indicated that Dr. Nolan is at liberty to return to full, 
 independent practice.

Appeal: No Appeal

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)