Nolan, Liana Marie (CPSO#: 60916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterloo Region Public Health
99 Regina Street South
P O Box 1633
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V3
Phone: (519) 883-2240
Fax: (519) 883-2241
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANA MARIE NOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1999