Nolan, Thomas Joseph (CPSO#: 67866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
235 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5
Phone: (905) 641-1500
Fax: (905) 641-1501
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas J. Nolan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nolan ( CPSO# 67866 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
235 Martindale Road
Unit 9
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 641-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS JOSEPH NOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998