Noor, Amra (CPSO#: 87644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St .Joseph Health Centre
100 Westmount Street
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone: (519) 824-6000 Ext. 4270
Fax: 519 767 3438
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 Bridle Path
Guelph ON  N0B2J0
Canada
Phone: 519 836 8320
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6440
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

North Wellington Health Care Corp.
630 Dublin street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 323-2210
Fax: (519) 323-2955
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 union St.E
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amra Noor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Noor ( CPSO# 87644 )

Business Address:
St Joseph Health Centre
100 Westmount Street
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 624-6000

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMRA NOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008