Noora, Joseph (CPSO#: 73500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Noora ( CPSO# 73500 )

Business Address:
Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-2550

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH NOORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006