Noorni Venkataraman, Ramaswamy (CPSO#: 99323)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Bharathiar University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013