Noorwali, Abdulsalam A A (CPSO#: 70775)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 07 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Sep 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Sep 1998 to 07 Sep 1999
Resident 6 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Sep 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1999