Noorwali, Fatma Abdoulraheem A M (CPSO#: 69656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OM aL SALAM ST
JEDDAH 21411
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 026240000 Ext. 22961
Fax: 22972

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATMA ABDOULRAHEEM A M NOORWALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORWALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 25 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 1996 to 25 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 1997 to 25 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 1998 to 25 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2002